Lo, Raymond Ching-Tat (CPSO#: 30789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 521-2737
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lo and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lo ( CPSO# 30789 )
Dr. L. Cheng ( CPSO# 31630 )

Business Address:
406 - 1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 521-2737

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 751-5520

Business Address:
220 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 528-8088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND CHING-TAT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1979