Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lobo, Louella Stephanie (CPSO#: 66721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 38
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: (905) 792-2901
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louella Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lobo ( CPSO# 66721 )

Business Address:
Suite 38
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUELLA STEPHANIE LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995