Lockhart, Michelle Anne (CPSO#: 59498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: Gonsalves, Michelle Anne (used until: 16 Aug 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: (519) 472-7732
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. A. Lockhart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lockhart ( CPSO# 59498 )

Business Address:
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone Number: (519) 472-0040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANNE LOCKHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKHART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1990