Lockman, Julie Marie Isabel (CPSO#: 68305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
869 Rue Notre-Dame
C P 1259
Embrun ON  K0A 1W0
Phone: (613) 443-3311
Fax: (613) 443-0142
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713, chemin Montréal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 748-4950
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lockman Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lockman ( CPSO# 68305 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 748-4950

Business Address:
869 Notre Dame Street
Embrun ON  K0A 1W0
Phone Number: (613) 443-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE MARIE ISABEL LOCKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996