Logan, Alexander Gordon (CPSO#: 20943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 435
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5187
Fax: (416) 586-5039
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER GORDON LOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1974