Logan, William Joseph (CPSO#: 42343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 1978

Expiry Date:  01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chicago, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division Of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6660
Fax: (416) 813-6334
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Bloorview Kids Rehab
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 3240
Fax: (416) 424-3837
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Surrey Place Centre
2 Surrey Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-5141
Fax: (416) 923-8476
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-596-4200
Fax: 416-813-6334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 Sep 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  William  Joseph  Logan  may  practise  medicine  only  in a clinical
                  teaching  unit  that  is  formally  affiliated  with  the  Department  of
                  Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Logan holds  a  teaching
                  or research appointment at the rank of full professor.

            2.    Dr.  Logan  may  practise  medicine  only  to  the extent required by the
                  teaching  or  research requirements of the appointment,  referred  to  in
                  clause 1.

            3.    The certificate  automatically expires when Dr. Logan no longer holds the
                  academic appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This certificate expires  on  July  1,  2018,  but  will be renewed on an
                  annual basis, subject to confirmation of Dr. Logan's  continuing academic
                  appointment.