Lok, Henry Tak-Chee (CPSO#: 26039)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henry Lok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Apr 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016