Lombardi, Pietro (CPSO#: 65331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
East York ON  M4H 1C4
Phone: (416) 425-8800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pietro Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lombardi ( CPSO# 65331 )

Business Address:
Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 425-8800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIETRO LOMBARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMBARDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993