Look Hong, Nicole Janelle (CPSO#: 81038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-3255
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William A. Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Look Hong ( CPSO# 81038 )
Dr. W. Look Hong ( CPSO# 31787 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521


Corporation Name: Nicole Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Look Hong ( CPSO# 81038 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4832

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE JANELLE LOOK HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOOK HONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012