Look Kin, Karen Teresa (CPSO#: 81373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Look Kin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Look Kin ( CPSO# 81373 )

Business Address:
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 932-3172

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN TERESA LOOK KIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOOK KIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006