Loosley-Millman, Margot Elizabeth (CPSO#: 55346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 James Street South
4th Floor, Fontbonne Hall
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone: (905) 572-1117
Fax: (905) 572-7373
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margot Loosley-Millman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loosley-Millman ( CPSO# 55346 )

Business Address:
301 James Street South
4th Floor, Fontbonne Building
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 572-1117

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGOT ELIZABETH LOOSLEY-MILLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOOSLEY-MILLMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988