Lopez de Lara Gutierrez, Catalina (CPSO#: 99543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma de Guadalajara, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W02C
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 3359
Fax: (416) 785-2450
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Lopez de Lara Gutierrez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lopez de Lara Gutierrez ( CPSO# 99543 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W02D
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATALINA LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 28 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013