Lougheed, Merla Diane (CPSO#: 56947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102 Stuart Street
Richardson House
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2348
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Diane Lougheed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lougheed ( CPSO# 56947 )

Business Address:
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-2348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERLA DIANE LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1988