Love, Jonathan Richard (CPSO#: 55637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone: (519) 787-0800
Fax: (519) 787-9902
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN RICHARD LOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986