Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Love, William Robert (CPSO#: 51022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
488 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone: (905) 632-3025
Fax: (905) 632-2893
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William R. Love, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Love ( CPSO# 51022 )

Business Address:
488 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3025

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ROBERT LOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1983