Lowe, David Arthur (CPSO#: 59753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health and Wellness
University of Toronto
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 971-2089
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

East Toronto Physio
1577 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1H7
Canada
Phone: (416) 691-3943
Fax: (416) 691-4755
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Sports Medicine Specialists
5th Floor
150 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-1601
Fax: (416) 481-1267
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Lowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lowe ( CPSO# 59753 )

Business Address:
East Toronto Physio
4 - 1577 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1H7
Phone Number: (416) 691-3943

Business Address:
The Sports Medicine Specialists
150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Phone Number: (416) 481-1601

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARTHUR LOWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989