Lozon, Alan Marc (CPSO#: 68998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5104
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-3662
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Lozon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lozon ( CPSO# 68998 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Suite 5104
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-3662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN MARC LOZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2000