Lubell, Richard Frank (CPSO#: 21843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Fanshawe Park Road East
London ON  N5X 3V9
Phone: (519) 850-3800
Fax: (519) 850-5099
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard F. Lubell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lubell ( CPSO# 21843 )

Business Address:
101 Fanshawe Park Road East
London ON  N5X 3V9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 15, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Richard Frank Lubell
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lubell to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. RICHARD FRANK LUBELL
                                            ("Dr. Lubell")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lubell, certificate of registration number 21843, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215183 ("Investigation") into whether I engaged in
                  professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my pediatrics practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor acceptable to the College ("Clinical
                        Supervisor"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of
                        the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me and review at least ten (10) of my patient
                              charts once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        medical inspector dated June 30, 2016, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date the ICR Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Lubell, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Lubell, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        ("Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   the University of Toronto's Medical Record Keeping course,
                              or, if this program is unavailable, another program
                              satisfactory to the College in medical record keeping; 
                  
                        (ii)  a 2000-word written summary encompassing: 
                  
                              1.    College Policy #4-12: Medical Records;
                  
                              2.    College Policy #3-15: Consent to Treatment; 
                  
                              3.    The Practice Guide: Medical Professionalism and College
                                    Policies; and
                  
                              4.    My self-study of (1) verucca vulgaris treatment options
                                    in children and (2) diagnosis, investigation and
                                    management of eating disorders in children; 
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and any participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to complete this requirement within twelve
                        (12) months of 
                        the Effective Date.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor").  I acknowledge and agree
                        that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may
                        discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lubell, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor's recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Lubell, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor which the ICR Committee
                              has identified in its decision referenced in section (7)(d)
                              as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lubell, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lubell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this
                  Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Lubell, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Lubell was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
                        pediatrics practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              "Dr. Lubell will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor 
                              acceptable to the College for six months. 
                  
                              "Dr. Lubell will engage in professional education in medical
                              record-keeping, consent to treatment, medical
                              professionalism, and the diagnosis, investigation and
                              management of eating disorders and verucca vulgaris in
                              children. 
                  
                              "Dr. Lubell's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Lubell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Lubell, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Frank Lubell to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 15, 2017:

Dr. Lubell was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his pediatrics practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Lubell will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.

Dr. Lubell will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, consent to treatment, medical professionalism, and the diagnosis, investigation and management of eating disorders and verucca vulgaris in children.

Dr. Lubell’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.