Ludwin, David (CPSO#: 33237)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ludwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Hospital, 50 Charlton Avenue East, Hamilton, ON, L8N 4A6
Date Received: 05 Dec 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2017