Lukasik, Mark Henry (CPSO#: 54237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SaveSight Vision Centre
Suite 106
345 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1L3
Phone: (519) 371-1930
Fax: (519) 371-8634
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.H. Lukasik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lukasik ( CPSO# 54237 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
345 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1L3
Phone Number: (519) 371-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK HENRY LUKASIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKASIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985