Luke, Patrick Pak Wai (CPSO#: 66493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus Site
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3180
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Luke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Luke ( CPSO# 66493 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus Site
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK PAK WAI LUKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000