Luke, Seema (CPSO#: 66738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Gupta, Seema (used until: 27 Jun 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: (519) 472-7732
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seema Luke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Luke ( CPSO# 66738 )

Business Address:
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone Number: (519) 472-0040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEEMA LUKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995