Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lukomska, Katarzyna Elzbieta (CPSO#: 68559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 476-0086
Fax: (705) 476-7850
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lukomska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lukomska ( CPSO# 68559 )

Business Address:
202 - 1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone Number: (705) 476-0086

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATARZYNA ELZBIETA LUKOMSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKOMSKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1994