Lum, Jeffrey Hoonway (CPSO#: 65913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Station Square Medical Clinic
150 - 6200 McKay Avenue
Burnaby BC  V5H4L7
Phone: (604) 438-8288
Fax: (604) 438-8289
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY HOONWAY LUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1992