Lummack, Keith Fredrick (CPSO#: 23531)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Lummack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 203 132 Parkdale Avenue South Hamilton ON L8K 3P3 Tel: (905) 545-7711
Date Received: 10 Apr 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015