Lynde, Charles Walter (CPSO#: 33330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Main Street Markham North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3
Phone: (905) 471-5022
Fax: (905) 471-1878
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Canada
Phone: 807 346 1000
Fax: 807 346 6251
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5953
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Shops on Steeles Medical Centre
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles W Lynde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lynde ( CPSO# 33330 )

Business Address:
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1

Business Address:
25 Main Street Markham North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3
Phone Number: (905) 471-5022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES WALTER LYNDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982