Lynett, Christopher Patrick (CPSO#: 68900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St Catharines ON  L2T 3B2
Phone: (905) 687-8887
Fax: (905) 641-3693
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Lynett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lynett ( CPSO# 68900 )

Business Address:
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St Catharines ON  L2T 3B2
Phone Number: (905) 687-8887

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PATRICK LYNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1997