Lyttle, Brian Douglas (CPSO#: 51029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
239 Oxford Street
London ON  N6A 1V2
Phone: (519) 433-2242
Fax: (519) 645-7565
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Lyttle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lyttle ( CPSO# 51029 )

Business Address:
239 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1V2
Phone Number: (519) 433-2242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DOUGLAS LYTTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYTTLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1988