Ma, Yunfei (CPSO#: 106906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  21 Aug 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Block Line Medical Clinic
200-1450 Block Line Road
Kitchener ON  N2C 0A5
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Yunfei  Ma may practise family medicine at Block Line Medical Clinic
                  in  Kitchener,   Ontario,   while  under  supervision  coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Ma's eligibility to take  the College of
                  Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Ma's knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required reports to the College  by  the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Ma's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 22, 2017,  and  will  expire  on  or
                  before August 21, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.