MacEwan, Elspeth Allan (CPSO#: 51067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Phone: 613-596-4344
Fax: 613-701-4206
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

28 Prescott Street
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 868-9642 Ext. 4
Fax: 613-701-4206
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELSPETH ALLAN MACEWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACEWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1987