MacGillivray, Patrick Stephen (CPSO#: 87202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services
Centre Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 945-1550
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick MacGillivray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. MacGillivray ( CPSO# 87202 )

Business Address:
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1601

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK STEPHEN MACGILLIVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGILLIVRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010