MacLean, Tanya Marie (CPSO#: 71315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrie & Community Family Medicine
Clinics
829 Big Bay Point Road
Unit D1, PO Box 10
Barrie ON  L4N 0G5
Phone: (705) 721-1689
Fax: (705) 721-0724
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prenatal & Well Baby Clinic
370 Bayview Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4N 8Y2
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-0370 Ext. 4
Fax: (705) 725-8781
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA MARIE MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999