MacLeod, Bryan Robert Angus (CPSO#: 69944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o St Joseph's Health Centre
Chronic Pain Management Program
710 Victoria St. East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone: (807) 623-7451
Fax: 807-624-3595
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacLeod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. MacLeod ( CPSO# 69944 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Chronic Pain Management Program
710 Victoria Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone Number: (807) 623-7451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN ROBERT ANGUS MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998