MacPhadyen, Norris Bruce (CPSO#: 65354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7525
Fax: (905) 848-7295
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017


Corporation Name: MacPhadyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Macphadyen ( CPSO# 65354 )

Business Address:
208-1077 North Service Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 566-1548

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga Site
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7525

Business Address:
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 391-5778

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORRIS BRUCE MACPHADYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACPHADYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993