Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

MacRae, Helen Marie (CPSO#: 68485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 451
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2836
Fax: (416) 586-8644
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen MacRae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Macrae ( CPSO# 68485 )
Dr. B. Graham ( CPSO# 67698 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 451
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN MARIE MACRAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACRAE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1994