Macdonald, Russell David (CPSO#: 63866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ornge Transport Medicine
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone: (647) 428-2034
Fax: (647) 428-2006
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Emergency Services - Room C753
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Fax: (416) 480-4074
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Paramedic Services
4330 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H5R9
Canada
Phone: 416 397 9071
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL DAVID MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1992