Maciver, Angus Graham (CPSO#: 30719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hopital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 273-4100
Fax: (519) 273-3208
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angus Maciver Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maciver ( CPSO# 30719 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 273-4100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGUS GRAHAM MACIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACIVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1979