Mackenzie, Alexander Euan (CPSO#: 54572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2772
Fax: 613 738 4833
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.E. Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mackenzie ( CPSO# 54572 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 239-6048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER EUAN MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988