Mackinlay, Duncan Cameron (CPSO#: 55938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Mitton Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H3
Phone: (519) 332-8040
Fax: (519) 337-0522
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. MacKinlay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mackinlay ( CPSO# 55938 )

Business Address:
185 Mitton Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H3
Phone Number: (519) 332-8040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN CAMERON MACKINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINLAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)