Mackinnon, James Alastair (CPSO#: 52422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2372 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J9
Phone: (905) 607-1600
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Mackinnon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2011


Corporation Name: Dr. James Mackinnon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mackinnon ( CPSO# 52422 )

Business Address:
2372 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J9
Phone Number: (905) 607-1600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ALASTAIR MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987