Macleod, Mark David (CPSO#: 59694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
RoomE1-330
Westminster Tower
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 53059
Fax: (519) 685-8059
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. MacLeod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Macleod ( CPSO# 59694 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital, Westminster Tower
Room E1-330
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990