Macleod, Tara Lee (CPSO#: 52634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 690-6017
Fax: (416) 690-8052
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.L. Macleod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Macleod ( CPSO# 52634 )

Business Address:
Suite 213
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 690-6017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA LEE MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Sep 1987
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1985