Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Macnabb, Nancy Jean (CPSO#: 63800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
600 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8H2
Phone: (519) 624-9887
Fax: (519) 624-6801
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 14
500 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 1X3
Canada
Phone: (519) 893-4620
Fax: (519) 895-9022
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY JEAN MACNABB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNABB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992