Macrae, Duncan Lloyd (CPSO#: 25958)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duncan MacRae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 17 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre 800 Commissioners Road East London, ON N6A 5W9 Tel: 519 685 8500 ext. 55699 Fax: 519 685 8468
Instructions: Please contact Dr. John Yoo for medical records.
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015