Madan, Nipun Mohan Lal (CPSO#: 66734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Madan, Nipun (used until: 10 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 Brock Road North
Guelph ON  N1H 6H9
Phone: (519) 224-0549 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 224-0550
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

550 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L8
Canada
Phone: (519) 224-0540
Fax: (519) 224-0546
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Madan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Madan ( CPSO# 66734 )

Business Address:
28 Brock Road North
Guelph ON  N0B 2J0
Phone Number: (519) 224-0549

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIPUN MOHAN LAL MADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996