Madarnas, Yolanda (CPSO#: 62649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective
Association
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-9965 Ext. 685
Fax: (613) 725-1300
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Madarnas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Madarnas ( CPSO# 62649 )

Business Address:
Canadian Medical Protective Association
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone Number: (613) 725-9965

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOLANDA MADARNAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADARNAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991