Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Maddison, Glen Jerome (CPSO#: 33197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospice
475 Christina Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H6
Phone: (519) 337-0537
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glen Maddison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maddison ( CPSO# 103680)
Dr. G. Maddison ( CPSO# 33197 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospice of Sarnia Lambton
475 N. Christina Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H6
Phone Number: (519) 337-0537

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN JEROME MADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADDISON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1982