Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Madikiza, Aggrey Pakamile (CPSO#: 55205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Xhosa, Zulu

Education:University of Natal, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woburn Medical Dental Centre
4129 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone: (416) 439-1991
Fax: (416) 439-3593
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Family Medical Care Centre
Suite 120
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 661-7000
Fax: (416) 661-0162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGGREY PAKAMILE MADIKIZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADIKIZA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1985