Madill, Robert William David (CPSO#: 41869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
64 Stone Haven Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 2Y2
Phone: (613) 592-0805
Fax: (613) 592-0961
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Madill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Madill ( CPSO# 41869 )

Business Address:
64 Stone Haven Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 2Y2
Phone Number: (613) 592-0805

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 23, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert William David
            Madill, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Madill to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Madill has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
                  the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the
                  corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized
                  as follows:
                              
                  
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 Relinquished

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        Relinquished

            All Other Monitored Drugs                                    
            (as defined under the Narcotic 
            Safety and Awareness Act, S.O. 
            2010, c. 22)                               Relinquished