Magder, Richard Jay (CPSO#: 52790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1920 Weston Road
Suite 218A
Toronto ON  M9N 1W4
Phone: (416) 614-8711
Fax: (416) 614-7566
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1236 Wilson Av
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAY MAGDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987